Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 618.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |