Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 2631.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1098.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1033.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 728.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|