LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB359
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB359
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB359
Compare Versions
SB359 Chaptered October 5, 2015
SB359 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB359 Amended August 28, 2015
SB359 Amended August 17, 2015
SB359 Amended July 16, 2015
SB359 Amended June 24, 2015
SB359 Amended June 2, 2015
SB359 Amended April 23, 2015
SB359 Amended April 6, 2015
SB359 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB359 Chaptered October 5, 2015
SB359 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB359 Amended August 28, 2015
SB359 Amended August 17, 2015
SB359 Amended July 16, 2015
SB359 Amended June 24, 2015
SB359 Amended June 2, 2015
SB359 Amended April 23, 2015
SB359 Amended April 6, 2015
SB359 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare