|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 759, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2787.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3127.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (September 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 774.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1702.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 544.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|