07/13/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/13/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/01/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2178.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23). | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1071.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 982.) (May 12). | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 12. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |