Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 12/16/2015 | January 5 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 12/10/2015 | Set for hearing January 5. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | April 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 6. Page 620.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | April 7 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |