|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 733, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 23. Page 3025.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 1201.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1152.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 523.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|