08/07/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2015. | |||
08/07/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/30/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2328.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 632.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 7). | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |