Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 01/13/2016 | January 13 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 2896.) | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | Set for hearing January 13. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |