|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2368.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2694.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1201.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1152.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
April 20 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 521.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|