07/13/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/13/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/01/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 2176.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22). | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 996.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 920.) (May 6). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |