Senate
|
02/01/2016
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 822.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
April 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|