California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB376 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015