Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2016 | January 21 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2016 | Set for hearing January 21. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2016 | January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2016 | Set for hearing January 19. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2895.) (January 13). | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | Set for hearing January 13. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |