|
10/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 418, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2565.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 2923.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 17)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 983.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|