Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2952.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2934.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2886.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 596.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|