California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015