Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 928.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Set for hearing May 4. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 731.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2015 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 12/02/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | ||
Senate | 12/01/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |