Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | April 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |