Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1287.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1153.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 858.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
April 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|