|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2779.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 3186.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (September 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
July 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1241.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1145.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|