Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 861.) (April 29). | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 647.) (April 15). | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 29 in HEALTH pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |