LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB407
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB407
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB407
Compare Versions
SB407 Chaptered September 21, 2015
SB407 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB407 Amended July 7, 2015
SB407 Amended June 17, 2015
SB407 Amended April 21, 2015
SB407 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB407 Chaptered September 21, 2015
SB407 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB407 Amended July 7, 2015
SB407 Amended June 17, 2015
SB407 Amended April 21, 2015
SB407 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare