LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB41
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB41
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB41
Action History
Senate
02/01/2016
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
01/14/2016
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
01/15/2015
Referred to Com. on G.O.
Senate
12/02/2014
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
Senate
12/01/2014
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.