|
09/03/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2433.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1028.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 793.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 722.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|