08/11/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2015. | |||
08/11/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/30/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 2327.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30). | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 559.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 508.) (April 7). | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |