|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 609, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2751.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Set for hearing September 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2953.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and G.O. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 633.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|