Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1202.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1153.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 4. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 7). | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |