LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB421
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB421
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB421
Compare Versions
SB421 Chaptered September 21, 2015
SB421 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB421 Amended June 19, 2015
SB421 Amended May 4, 2015
SB421 Amended April 6, 2015
SB421 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB421 Chaptered September 21, 2015
SB421 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB421 Amended June 19, 2015
SB421 Amended May 4, 2015
SB421 Amended April 6, 2015
SB421 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare