|
07/15/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1782.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2232.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 772.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|