Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 4. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 522.) (April 8). | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |