08/10/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2015. | |||
08/10/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/30/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 2326.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24). | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 841.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1702.) (April 8). | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |