California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB432 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/10/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 432CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 160 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 10, 2015 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 10, 2015 PASSED THE SENATE APRIL 30, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 27, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Mendoza FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to repeal Sections 1725 and 2015 of the Labor Code, relating to public works. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 432, Mendoza. Public works: aliens. Existing law, with certain exceptions, requires the payment of not less than the general prevailing rate of per diem wages, for work of a similar character in the locality in which a public works project is performed, to all workers employed on a public works project. With respect to the extension of public works, existing law extends preference for employment first to California citizens, next to citizens of other states who are in California at the time of application, and next to aliens who are in California at the time of application. Existing law defines "alien" as any person who is not a born or fully naturalized citizen of the United States. Under existing law, the Department of Finance is required to ascertain and secure from state agencies tentative plans for the extension of public works that are best adapted to supply increased opportunities for advantageous public labor during periods of temporary unemployment in the state. These employment opportunities are available according to the hiring preferences described above. This bill would repeal this definition of "alien" and the provision requiring those preferences to be applied to the extension of public works employment during periods of unemployment in the state. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 1725 of the Labor Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 2015 of the Labor Code is repealed.