Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
July 13 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2015
|
June 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1095.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 725.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|