Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
July 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1289.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 982.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
May 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 731.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|