California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill July 8, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015