|
09/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2205.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
June 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1031.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 522.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|