Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
August 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 4. Page 1254.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1154.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
May 4 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 651.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|