10/06/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 539, Statutes of 2015. | |||
10/06/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 09/03/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 2680.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 842.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 722.) (April 22). | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |