Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 822.) (April 28). | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |