Senate
|
02/01/2016
|
Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Allen.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 17. Page 1334.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Allen. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1335.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1154.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 858.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 821.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29 in E.Q. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|