California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 19, 2015
Bill June 9, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015