Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1154.) (May 28). | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 11. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 647.) (April 15). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |