Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2854.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1254.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1154.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 794.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|