California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB469 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill July 13, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015