Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 01/14/2016 | January 13 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 2894.) | ||
Senate | 01/07/2016 | Set for hearing January 13. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | April 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 349.) (March 18). | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Set for hearing March 18. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2015 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 01/05/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/18/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 17. | ||
Senate | 12/17/2014 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected January 12). |