California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB479 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Amended

Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 13, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015