LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB48
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB48
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB48
Compare Versions
SB48 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB48 Amended September 9, 2015
SB48 Amended September 4, 2015
SB48 Amended August 28, 2015
SB48 Amended July 7, 2015
SB48 Amended June 24, 2015
SB48 Amended May 6, 2015
SB48 Amended April 14, 2015
SB48 Introduced December 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB48 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB48 Amended September 9, 2015
SB48 Amended September 4, 2015
SB48 Amended August 28, 2015
SB48 Amended July 7, 2015
SB48 Amended June 24, 2015
SB48 Amended May 6, 2015
SB48 Amended April 14, 2015
SB48 Introduced December 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare