California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB481 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2015

Amended

Bill June 18, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015