|
10/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 419, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2378.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2628.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 881.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 779.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|